How to Multiply using Lattice Step 1 How

  • Slides: 23
Download presentation
How to Multiply using Lattice

How to Multiply using Lattice

Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 23 X 5 You need 2

Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 23 X 5 You need 2 boxes on top and 1 on the side.

Step 2: Set up the Lattice Box 2 3 5

Step 2: Set up the Lattice Box 2 3 5

Step 3: Multiply 2 by 5 2 3 1 0 5

Step 3: Multiply 2 by 5 2 3 1 0 5

Step 4: Multiply 3 by 5 2 3 1 1 0 5 5

Step 4: Multiply 3 by 5 2 3 1 1 0 5 5

Step 5: Add the numbers between the slanted lines 2 3 1 1 1

Step 5: Add the numbers between the slanted lines 2 3 1 1 1 0 1 5 5 5

Step 6: Write your answer to the problem 2 3 1 1 1 0

Step 6: Write your answer to the problem 2 3 1 1 1 0 1 5 5 5 23 x 5 =115

Multiplying 2 digit by 2 digit

Multiplying 2 digit by 2 digit

Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 47 X 12 You need 2

Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 47 X 12 You need 2 boxes on top and 2 on the side.

Step 2: Set up the Lattice Box 4 7 1 2

Step 2: Set up the Lattice Box 4 7 1 2

Step 3: Multiply 4 by 1 4 0 4 7 1 2

Step 3: Multiply 4 by 1 4 0 4 7 1 2

Step 4: Multiply 4 by 2 4 7 0 4 1 0 8 2

Step 4: Multiply 4 by 2 4 7 0 4 1 0 8 2

Step 5: Multiply 7 by 1 4 7 0 0 4 7 1 0

Step 5: Multiply 7 by 1 4 7 0 0 4 7 1 0 8 2

Step 6: Multiply 7 by 2 4 7 0 0 7 4 1 1

Step 6: Multiply 7 by 2 4 7 0 0 7 4 1 1 0 8 4 2

Step 7: Add up the numbers between the slanted lines. 4 7 1 0

Step 7: Add up the numbers between the slanted lines. 4 7 1 0 0 7 4 0 1 0 8 5 6 1 4 4 2 If sum = more than 9, carry by adding the number to the slanted row to the left.

Step 8: Write the answer to the multiplication problem. 4 7 47 x 12=564

Step 8: Write the answer to the multiplication problem. 4 7 47 x 12=564 1 0 0 7 4 0 1 0 8 5 6 1 4 4 2

Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 783 X 532 You need 3

Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 783 X 532 You need 3 boxes on top and 3 on the side.

Step 2: Set up your lattice box. 7 8 3 5 3 2

Step 2: Set up your lattice box. 7 8 3 5 3 2

Step 3: Multiply 7 by 5, 3, & 2. 7 8 3 3 5

Step 3: Multiply 7 by 5, 3, & 2. 7 8 3 3 5 5 2 3 1 1 4 2

Step 4: Multiply 8 by 5, 3, & 2. 7 8 3 4 5

Step 4: Multiply 8 by 5, 3, & 2. 7 8 3 4 5 3 5 0 2 2 4 1 1 3 1 4 6 2

Step 5: Multiply 3 by 5, 3, & 2. 7 8 3 1 4

Step 5: Multiply 3 by 5, 3, & 2. 7 8 3 1 4 5 3 0 2 2 5 0 3 4 1 1 1 4 5 9 0 6 6 2

Step 6: Add up the numbers between the slanted lines. 7 8 3 1

Step 6: Add up the numbers between the slanted lines. 7 8 3 1 1 3 5 4 0 2 5 5 2 0 3 4 1 1 1 4 9 1 1 1 6 4 6 5 0 5 6 6 2 If the sum = more than 9, carry by adding the number to the slanted row to the left.

Step 7: Write the sum of the multiplication problem. 7 8 3 1 1

Step 7: Write the sum of the multiplication problem. 7 8 3 1 1 3 5 4 0 2 5 5 2 0 3 4 1 1 1 4 9 1 1 1 6 4 6 5 0 5 6 6 2 783 x 532 = 416, 556